HI HB1278 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Act 001, 03/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Act 001, 03/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definitions of benefit year and week. Conforms the manner of filing claims for partial benefits to the same as for total or part-total benefits. Provides relief for certain reimbursable employers. Requires the director of labor and industrial relations to omit benefits charged for experience rating for employers due to the event of COVID-19 in calendar years 2021 and 2022. For calendar years 2021 and 2022, sets the employer contribution rate at schedule D. Makes amendments to contribution rate schedule and procedure for determination retroactive to 1/1/2021. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Employment Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Act 001, 03/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101). |
2021-03-02 | House | Act 001, on 03/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101). |
2021-02-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-02-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 28). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-22-21. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from LCA/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 570) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 3:30PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to LCA/WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 5). |
2021-02-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1). |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported from LAT/FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT/FIN on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to LAT/FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |