HI HB1273 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii CTAHR cooperative extension service to support the growth and sustainability of the agriculture industry. Effective July 1, 2069. (HB1273 HD1)
Title
Appropriations; University of Hawaii; CTAHR
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Reported from AGR/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 134) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Awana, Chang, Hanohano, Mizuno, Takai, Takumi, Wooley, Ching, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Saiki. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Marumoto. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/HED on Thursday, 02-03-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to AGR/HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1338 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - (S) Referred to AGL/EDU, WAM.