HI HB1259 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1259
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a clean transportation fee to be paid from a tax on fuel sales. Establishes the zero emissions vehicle infrastructure special fund to be funded by a percentage of the clean transportation fee for the purpose of expediting the development of electric charging and hydrogen fueling infrastructure throughout the State to enable and promote the use of zero emissions vehicles. Establishes the zero emissions vehicle rebate special fund to provide rebates for the purchase of new zero emissions vehicles within the State so long as funds are available.
Title
Relating To Clean Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1187 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1259 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1259 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Clean Transportation Fee
Fuel Tax
Zero Emissions Vehicle Infrastructure Special Fund
Zero Emissions Vehicle Rebate Special Fund
Fuel Tax
Zero Emissions Vehicle Infrastructure Special Fund
Zero Emissions Vehicle Rebate Special Fund
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1259&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1259_.HTM |