HI HB1225 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes and appropriates funds for DBEDT, in collaboration with DOA, to perform studies and analysis relating to establishing facilities on the island of Hawaii for quarantine inspection and treatment and handling of incoming and outgoing agricultural commodities. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural Quarantine Facility; Study and Analysis; Island of Hawaii; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2015-03-25SenateReported from AGL/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1021) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2015-03-23SenateThe committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero.
2015-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-23-15 3:25PM in conference room 016.
2015-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
2015-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on AGL/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 3:30PM in conference room 414.
2015-03-10SenateReferred to AGL/EDT, WAM.
2015-03-10SenatePassed First Reading.
2015-03-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 112).
2015-03-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2015-03-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 651), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2015-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2015-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2015-02-18HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
2015-02-18HouseReported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 282), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2015-02-10HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Ito.
2015-02-10HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Cachola, Choy, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Ito.
2015-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2015-02-09HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-12-15 8:30AM in conference room 312.
2015-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Thursday, 02-12-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2015-02-02HouseReferred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2015-01-29HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2015-01-28HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback