HI HB1225 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Choy, Cullen, Fontaine, Hashem, Johanson, M. Lee, Marumoto, Morita, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows bingo to be conducted by 1 licensee at 1 location on lands designated by the Hawaiian homes commission. Creates Hawaii bingo commission within department of commerce and consumer affairs to regulate bingo. Allocates 20% of general excise tax on gross receipts to the state general fund; 1% for a compulsive gambler program; up to 4% for administrative expenses; and the balance for deposit into the Hawaiian home lands trust fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bingo; One Location; Department of Hawaiian Home Lands

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-18 (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Choy, Cullen, Fontaine, Hashem, Johanson, M. Lee, Marumoto, Morita, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused.
2011-02-18 (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 581), recommending referral to FIN.
2011-02-17 (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Morita.
2011-02-15 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-17-11 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
2011-02-11 (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Choy, Cullen, Fontaine, Johanson, M. Lee, Marumoto, Morita, Nishimoto, Takai, Takumi, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no (15) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Hashem excused (2).
2011-02-11 (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2011-02-09 (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Yamane, Pine; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
2011-02-04 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-09-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2011-01-26 (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
2011-01-26 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2011-01-25 (H) Pending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback