HI HB120 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB120
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a two-year beach protection pilot program under which no vehicles are authorized to drive on the beach in Polihale state park or on any beach in Kekaha, Kauai, under the jurisdiction of DLNR without a permit. Requires DLNR to work with the county of Kauai on the feasibility of establishing a similar pilot program for the beach at Kekaha beach park under the jurisdiction of the county. Requires report to the legislature. Repeals on 6/30/2023.
Title
Relating To Driving On Beaches.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB120 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB178 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB178 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=120&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB120_.HTM |