HI SB178 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB178
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a two-year beach protection pilot program under which no vehicles are authorized to drive on the beach in Polihale state park without a permit. Requires a report to the legislature. Effective 5/6/2137. Repeals on 6/30/2023. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Driving On Beaches.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 163) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 139) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Misalucha, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-29-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB178 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB120 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB120 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Beach Protection Pilot Program
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Driving on Beaches
Polihale State Park
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Driving on Beaches
Polihale State Park