HI HB1195 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1195
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Health and Department of Human Services, including the Office of Youth Services, to provide homeless outreach services and rental subsidies to reduce and prevent homelessness. Takes effect on 7/1/2075. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 11:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Keith-Agaran, English Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Belatti, Gates Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 638) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1102) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 61). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 780), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1214 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, JDC/WAM.
HB1195 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 9:05AM in conference room 229.
HB1195 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 9:05AM in conference room 229.