HI HB1194 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provision requiring counties to adopt ordinances regulating agricultural tourism as a precondition for allowing agricultural tourism activities in an agricultural district. Allows agricultural commerce, rather than agricultural tourism, in an agricultural district. (HB1194 HD1)
Title
Agricultural Districts; Tourism; Commerce; County Regulation
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-27 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 03-02-15 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-27 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-02-15 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 03-02-15 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-24 | House | Re-referred to TOU, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 24 |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) DeCoite, Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kawakami voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 568) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-18-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-09 | House | Re-referred to TOU, JUD, referral sheet 12 |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to AGR/TOU, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |