HI HB119 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 650) in amended form (SD 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Replaces E Ola Mau Na Leo O Kekaha with Kaunalewa as the entity authorized to receive special purpose revenue bonds issued to assist with the acquisition, remediation, and development of the old Kekaha Sugar Mill in Kekaha, Kauai, Hawaii. Extends from 6/30/2024 to 6/30/2026, the lapse date for which the special purpose revenue bonds may be authorized. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Kaunalewa.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 650) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-04-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1674) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-04-07SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-03-25SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2021-03-11SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 185).
2021-03-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 938), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-10HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
2021-02-10HouseReported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 145) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-05HouseThe committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-05-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB174 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback