HI SB174 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces E Ola Mau Na Leo O Kekaha with Kaunalewa as the entity authorized to receive special purpose revenue bonds issued to assist with the acquisition, remediation, and development of the old Kekaha Sugar Mill in Kekaha, Kauai, Hawaii.
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Kaunalewa.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB174 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
HB119 (Same As) 2021-07-07 - Act 228, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).
HB119 (Same As) 2021-07-07 - Act 228, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=174&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB174_.HTM |