HI HB119 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a one-time amnesty program for delinquent income- tax obligations, provides equitable relief in certain tax situations, and places the burden of proof on the Department of Taxation in certain circumstances. Effective January 7, 2059. (HB119 HD1)
Title
Taxation; Amnesty; Burden of Proof; Equitable Relief
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 566) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Ito, McKelvey. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-10-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |