HI HB1185 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the continued operation and maintenance of the east Kauai irrigation system. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB1185 HD1)
Title
East Kauai Irrigation System; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-28-11 5:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-11 11:30AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 96) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-02-11 9:40AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1209 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33