HI HB1177 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restructures the Hawaii Employer-Union Heath Benefits Trust Fund (EUTF). Transfers jurisdiction over the EUTF from the Department of Budget and Finance to the Department of Human Resources Development. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1177 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 334). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 817) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-01-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |