HI HB1131 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state building code council to make determinations on the financial impact, including the impact on amortized utility costs, of the adoption of a code or standard on single-family and multi-family homes and include the determinations in its annual reports to the governor. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Building Code Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 3:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 94). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 707), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Perruso; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 306) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1131 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
SB1279 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
SB1279 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.