HI SB1279 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1279
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state building code council to: consider the impact of building codes and standards on the cost of single- and multi-family homes built in the State when considering whether to adopt a code or standard; and include with its annual written report to the governor a financial impact assessment on each code and standard adopted by the council.
Title
Relating To The State Building Code Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1279 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
HB1131 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
HB1131 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1279&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1279_.HTM |