HI HB1129 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the maritime commission to oversee the regulation of water carriers in the State. Transfers the oversight of water carriers by the public utilities commission to the maritime commission and makes associated conforming amendments. Establishes the maritime commission special fund. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Water Carriers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1348 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to TRS, CPN/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback