HI HB1121 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the acts of inflicting serious or substantial bodily injury upon a person who is pregnant in the course of committing or attempting to commit a felony to those actions for which an extended term of imprisonment may be given. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1121 HD1)
Title
Sentences for Injuries to Pregnant Women
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Pine. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-07-11 9:35AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |