HI HB1115 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the state supplemental payment amounts for specified types of adult residential care homes and other domiciliary care facilities and provides for annual adjustment. Changes the public assistance allowance to an unspecified percentage of the current federal poverty level.
Title
Adult Residential Care Homes; Domiciliary Care Facilities; State Supplemental Payment
Sponsors
Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-12-15 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1115&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1115_.HTM |