HI HB1113 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement of a conspiracy of two or more persons as an element of prohibited discriminatory practices in places of public accommodation. (HB1113 HD1)
Title
Relating To Discriminatory Practices In Public Accommodations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 403) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1113 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
SB979 (Same As) 2017-02-23 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
SB979 (Same As) 2017-02-23 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.