HI HB108 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-11 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-11 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of cruelty to animals by fighting dogs in the first and second degree. Increases penalty for cruelty to animals by fighting dogs in the first degree. Clarifies dog fighting and animal cruelty laws. Effective January 7, 2059. (HB108 HD1)
Title
Crimes; Dog Fighting; Animal Cruelty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 44). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (10). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita, Fontaine. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-24-11 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-24-11. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-15-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-03-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |