HI HB1077 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires farmers' market operators to procure a license to ensure that greater than 50 per cent of vendors in farmers' markets primarily sell food, farm produce, or flowers prepared, grown, or produced in Hawaii.
Title
Truth-in-Advertising; License; Locally Produced
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB171 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA/CPH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1077&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1077_.HTM |