HI HB1049 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (H) Act 081, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (H) Act 081, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Insurance Code and related provisions. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB1049 CD1)
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (H) Act 081, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184). | |
2011-06-06 | (S) Act 081, 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 63). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 63) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Chong, Hashem, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Souki. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 9:45AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Herkes, Chong Co-Chairs; Hashem, Ito, Souki, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 539) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1145) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 923) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-18-11 10:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 824) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 372) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Herkes, Yamane, Carroll, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Ching, Thielen. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-09-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1276 (Same As) 2011-03-21 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Saiki, Wooley excused (4).