HI HB1041 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Illegal Fireworks Task Force within the Department of Law Enforcement to plan, coordinate, and engage in law enforcement operations to interdict illegal fireworks, develop a comprehensive strategic plan to stop the importation of illegal fireworks and explosives into the State, promote compliance with the fireworks control laws, and ensure the safety and security of airports, harbors, and other facilities and institutions in the State against the discharge of illegal fireworks and explosives. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-07-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1339 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1041 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1041 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1041&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1041_.HTM |