HI HB1018 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Kalaeloa airport tenant advisory board.
Title
Kalaeloa Airport; Tenant Advisory Board
Sponsors
Rep. Andria Tupola [R] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1018&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1018_.HTM |