HI HB1017 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - Re-referred to EEP, WAL/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - Re-referred to EEP, WAL/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a one-year pilot program requiring DAGS, DOT, and DLNR to implement irrigation water conservation best management practices, as established by the Landscape Industry Council of Hawaii. Requires DAGS, DOT, and DLNR to submit a report regarding the results of the pilot program. Effective 07/01/2013.
Title
Water Conservation; Best Management Practices; Public Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | House | Re-referred to EEP, WAL/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL/TRN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1017&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB1017_.HTM |