HI HB1015 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1015

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the conditions and manner in which the board of land and natural resources may dispose of water by license. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Disposition Of Water Licenses By The Board Of Land And Natural Resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-03HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-03-02HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:15PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-02HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-21.
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-17HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Har, LoPresti, McKelvey, Okimoto, Tam, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
2021-02-17HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 311) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Morikawa, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, LoPresti, McKelvey, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and none excused (0).
2021-02-09HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 89) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-04HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1169 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - The committee on JDC has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 01-28-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
HB1015 (Carry Over) 2021-03-03 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback