HI HB1015 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1015
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the conditions and manner in which the board of land and natural resources may dispose of water by license. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Disposition Of Water Licenses By The Board Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:15PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-21. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Har, LoPresti, McKelvey, Okimoto, Tam, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 311) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Morikawa, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, LoPresti, McKelvey, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 89) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1015 (Carry Over) 2021-03-03 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1169 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB1169 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.