HI SB1169 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - The committee on JDC has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 01-28-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - The committee on JDC has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 01-28-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the conditions and manner in which the Board of Land and Natural Resources may dispose water by license. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Disposition Of Water Licenses By The Board Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | The committee on JDC has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 01-28-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Misalucha ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1015 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1169 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB1169 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.