OR HB4147 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 43, (2024 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 43, (2024 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of stop arm cameras on school buses to record people who do not stop for bus safety lights. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6). Permits an education provider to have stop arm cameras on school buses for the purpose of recording persons who fail to stop for bus safety lights. Permits a law enforcement agency to issue a citation for failure to stop for bus safety lights based on photographs or video if certain other conditions are met.
Title
Relating to school buses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Chapter 43, (2024 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2025. |
2024-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Woods. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Carried over to 03-05 by unanimous consent. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Carried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2024-02-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 5--Evans, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Yunker; Excused, 2--Lively, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boshart Davis, Goodwin, Kropf, Speaker Rayfield. |
2024-02-16 | House | Second reading. |
2024-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2024-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Education. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |