GA SB391 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 361
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 361
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to the State Road and Tollway Authority, so as to exempt transit service buses, motor vehicles, and rapid rail systems from requirements relating to identification and regulation of motor vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Road and Tollway Authority; requirements relating to identification and regulation of motor vehicles; exempt transit service buses, motor vehicles, and rapid rail systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #876 (Y: 160 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #554 (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #554 (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 361 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |