GA SB302 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 12 of Title 53 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to trusts, so as to provide that where no distribution has been made from a trust within certain times, the trustee shall notify the district attorney of the circuit in which the trust res is located; to provide that the district attorney shall determine whether the intent of the trust is being furthered; to provide for the filing of a petition to reform the trust; to provide for notification; to provide for an order; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Wills, Trusts, & Admin. of Estates; provide when no distribution has been made from a trust within certain time, notify district attorney of circuit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #601 - Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-12-30 | Senate Prefile |