GA SB286 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 350
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 350
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Troup County (formerly the Civil and Criminal Court of Troup County), approved March 6, 1962 (Ga. L. 1962, p. 3020), as amended, so as to authorize the court to charge and collect a technology fee for certain filings; to specify the uses to which said technology fees may be put; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Court of Troup County; charge and collect a technology fee for certain filings; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #767 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Vote #461 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Vote #461 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 350 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |