GA SB130 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to selling and other trade practices, so as to provide a short title; to provide for legislative intent; to provide definitions; to establish procedures and requirements for the electronic lease-purchase of goods; to provide for data and personal information protection practices; to provide that persons entering into electronic lease-purchase agreements shall receive certain information and have certain rights with regard to the goods that are the subject of such agreements; to provide for certain requirements for merchants with regard to websites and data transmission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Electronic Lease-Purchase of Goods Act; provide data and personal information protection practices; definitions; establish procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #210 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-17 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-10 | Senate Read and Referred |