GA HR36 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring the life and memory of Staff Sergeant Shaun J. Whitehead and dedicating a bridge in his honor; and for other purposes.
Title
Staff Sergeant Shaun J. Whitehead Memorial Bridge; Jackson County; dedicate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #414 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #301 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #223 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #301 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #223 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 93 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-26 | House | House Hopper |