GA HR1109 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that the sales and use tax for educational purposes that may be imposed by any school system can be used in part for educational programs and materials in public schools upon approval of voters; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; used for educational programs and materials in public schools upon approval of voters; provide - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] |
Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-22 | House | House Hopper |