GA HB988 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Macon County and to provide for its powers and duties, approved June 3, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 4532), so as to expand the board from three to five members; to provide for appointments to the board; to provide for terms of the additional board members; to remove expired and outdated provisions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Macon County; board of elections and registration; expand from three to five members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #548 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #510 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #510 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 464 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Hopper |