GA HB907 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to vacation of office, so as to provide for the appointment and election of a successor in the event of a vacancy in the office of district attorney; to provide for the term of such successor; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public officers and employees; appointment and election of successor in event of vacancy in the office of district attorney; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #621 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Vote #541 (Y: 116 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Vote #541 (Y: 116 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2018-03-22 | Act 291 | |
2018-03-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-03-21 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hopper |