GA HB536 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 36-15-11 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to receipt and disbursement of funds for county law libraries by counties having population of 950,000 or more, so as to repeal and reserve such Code section; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
County law libraries; receipt and disbursement of funds by counties having a population of 950,000; repeal and reserve Code section
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #244 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-04 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/39547 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/133301 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/39547#9868 |