GA HB418 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to abolish the office of elected county surveyor of Oglethorpe County; to provide for the appointment of a county surveyor by the governing authority of the county; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Oglethorpe County; county surveyor; provide appointment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #97 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Vote #96 - Local Calendar (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Vote #96 - Local Calendar (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Effective Date | |
2011-04-20 | Act 22 | |
2011-04-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-04 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-04 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-03 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-02 | House First Readers |