GA HB316 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to abandoned vessels, so as to remove the requirement of notification to the Georgia Bureau of Investigation and the Georgia Crime Information Center; to eliminate the requirement to place information regarding abandoned vessels into the National Crime Information Center network; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Abandoned vessels; notification to Georgia Bureau of Investigation and Georgia Crime Information Center; remove requirement
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] |
Rep. Al Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-12 | House | House Hopper |