GA HB313 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to educational programs within the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to revise certain provisions relating to calculating grade point averages for purposes of determining eligibility for enrollment and scholarships for postsecondary education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; calculating grade point averages; revise certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #317 - Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #274 - Pass (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #274 - Pass (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-21 | Act 39 | |
2009-04-21 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-12 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House First Readers |