GA HB311 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Effective Date 2023-03-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Effective Date 2023-03-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to provide for optional temporary tax relief to certain properties located in nationally declared federal disaster areas; to provide for rules, procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for appeals; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; optional temporary tax relief to certain properties located in nationally declared federal disaster areas; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #227 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 162, Hb 311, Hb 482, Hr 66: Senate Vote #221 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #110 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 162, Hb 311, Hb 482, Hr 66: Senate Vote #221 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #110 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Effective Date 2023-03-16 | |
2023-03-16 | Act 3 | |
2023-03-16 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-15 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-08 | House | House Hopper |