GA HB267 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to require the Department of Education to develop a comprehensive strategy and uniform program regarding the dangers of sending texts featuring explicit images; to provide for implementation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education, Department of; develop strategy regarding dangers of explicit images in texts; require
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-22 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-17 | House First Readers |