GA HB227 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide for the confidentiality of the addresses of certain registered voters; to provide for the manner of invoking such confidentiality; to provide for the terms and conditions of such confidentiality; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; address confidentiality; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Butler [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] |
Rep. Jerry Keen [R] | Rep. Barbara Sims [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #256 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House Vote #164 - Pass (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House Vote #164 - Pass (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-30 | Act 79 | |
2009-04-30 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-09 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-09 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-02 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-30 | House First Readers |