GA HB1427 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-06-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-06-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the Board of Education of Dooly County, approved April 6, 1967 (Ga. L. 1967, p. 2922), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 4149), so as to provide for compensation of the members of the board; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dooly County; Board of Education; provide for compensation of members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #761 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #665 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #665 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Effective Date 2024-06-01 | |
2024-05-06 | Act 661 | |
2024-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House Hopper |