GA HB1258 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-17-22 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Financing and Investment Commission, so as to provide for certain powers of the State Financing and Investment Commission in order to meet the requirements of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009, Public Law 111-5; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Financing and Investment Commission; powers to meet requirements; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Jim Cole [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] | Rep. James Mills [R] |
Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 375 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-17 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-08 | House First Readers |