FL S7018 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Transportation to plan, design, and construct staging areas as part of the turnpike system for the intended purpose of staging supplies for prompt provision of assistance to the public in a declared state of emergency; requiring the department to coordinate, develop, and recommend a master plan for the development of electric vehicle charging station infrastructure along the State Highway System; providing construction relating to the rights of an owner of land that has been traditionally used for agriculture and is subject to a conservation easement, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Essential State Infrastructure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#720 (Y: 97 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10 Chapter No. 2020-21
2020-06-09 Approved by Governor
2020-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 97 NAYS 19
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-05SenateAmendment(s) adopted (148826)
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20
2020-03-02SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-27SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2020-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2020-02-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-12-10SenateFiled
2019-12-09SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-12-02SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Same As/Similar To

S452 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H943 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H1239 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
H7099 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7018 passed
H203 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 410 passed
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S7020 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S410 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
337401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339287Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70406Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback