FL S0410 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting counties from adopting, after a specified date, a comprehensive plan, a land development regulation, or another form of restriction unless certain conditions are met; prohibiting a municipality from annexing specified areas under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to give a preference to certain counties and municipalities when selecting applications for funding for specified technical assistance; requiring local governments to include a property rights element in their comprehensive plans, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Growth Management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#686 (Y: 71 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Vetoed by Governor
2020-06-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 16 836
2020-03-12SenateConcurred in 2 amendment(s) (373229, 856967)
2020-03-11SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 71 NAYS 43
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (373229, 856967)
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-05HouseIn Messages
2020-03-05SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 14
2020-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-04SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-04SenateAmendment(s) adopted (524444, 778692)
2020-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-11SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-30SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-27SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2019-10-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H203 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 410 passed
S1398 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-122
H7099 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7018 passed
S7018 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-21
H519 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1766 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S7054 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633177Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
171042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/Amendment/667322/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/Vote/SenateVote_s00410e1027.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/Vote/HouseVote_s00410e1686.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/410/Vote/SenateVote_s00410e1040.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback