FL S7012 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions which provide a public records exemption for credit history information and credit scores held by the Office of Financial Regulation for purposes of licensing loan originators, mortgage brokers, and mortgage lenders; saving the exemption from repeal under the Open Government Sunset Review Act, etc.
Title
OGSR/Credit History Information and Credit Scores/Office of Financial Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#231 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Chapter No. 2015-73 | |
2015-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Substituted for HB 7089 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-04-17 | House | Received |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/15 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/19/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/03/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance |
Same As/Similar To
H7089 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7012 (Ch. 2015-73)